In this post i will show you how to multiply any two digit number with 11 verbally.

I am using term secondary number here for the number that we will multiply with 11

In 11*11 11 is secondary number

12*11 12 is secondary number

13 * 11 13 is secondary number

11*11 = 121

right most digit is the first number of the digit your multiplying here it is 1

middle digit is sum of of both number you are multiplying with 11 is 1+1 = 2

last digit is the one plus the carry

**if exist**from second number on from middle digit here it is 111*13 = 143

right most digit is the first number of the secondary number 3

middle digit is sum of of both number you are multiplying with 11 is (1+3) 4

last digit is the one plus the carry on from middle digit here it is 1

11 * 14 = 154

right most digit is the first number secondary number here it is 4

middle digit is sum of of secondary number ( 4 + 1) = 5

last digit is the one plus the carry

**if exist**from second number on from middle digit here it is 1Lets try bigger number

11* 24

right most digit is the first number secondary number 4

middle digit is sum of secondary number ( 4 + 2) =6

last digit is the one plus the carry

**if exist**from second number on from middle digit here it is 2so the answer is 264

11 * 89

right most digit is the first number secondary number9

middle digit is sum of secondary number (8+9) = 1

**7**
ast digit is the one plus the carry

**if exist**from second number on from middle digit here it is 8+1 = 9answer is 979

## No comments:

## Post a Comment